Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Foster O Decker, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hickey, Peter James, against Beach Hill Cattle Farms Llc, Sean M Rzeplinske, represented by Vandenburgh, John William, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 26, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 14, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 19, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 22, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 22, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 09, 2023 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
March 09, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Jury Selection Process Order |
||
February 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 22, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
August 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 19, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge McAllister requesting adjournment of discovery schedule |
||
October 27, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 26, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Proposed So Order Scheduling Letter Order |
||
September 17, 2021 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.