Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Seneca County. This case was filed in Seneca County Superior Courts with Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued Doyle (Court Activity) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
|
January 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Reassignment Ark (Court Activity) Judge: Ark, Hon. John J. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Doyle (Hearing) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Ark (Court Activity) Judge: Ark, Hon. John J. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Ark (Motion Part) Judge: Ark, Hon. John J. |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Ark (Motion Part) Judge: Ark, Hon. John J. |
|
July 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Doyle (Motion Part) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
|
July 27, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 09/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.