Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Foreclosure (MFC), Master presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure (MFC), Master Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
February 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Bender (Court Activity) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
January 31, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 02/21/2017Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
January 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
November 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Part (Motion Part) Judge: Foreclosure (MFC), Master |
|
November 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part (Hearing) Judge: Foreclosure (MFC), Master |
|
November 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Part (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Foreclosure (MFC), Master |
|
October 27, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 11/19/2016Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.