Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Bender, Hon. Dennis F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBender, Hon. Dennis F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2016 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
September 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Dismissed Bender (Court Activity) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Bender (Court Activity)
Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
August 28, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 09/28/2017Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
December 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
December 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
December 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.