Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Richard E Swinehart, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brennan, James Michael, Nussbaum, Carolyn G, against David G Mashewske, represented by Mashewske, David Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a Notice of Motion filed by Richard E. Swinehart against David G. Mashewske in the Supreme Court of New York, Seneca County. The motion seeks an order for summary judgment in lieu of a complaint on Swinehart's claim for the payment ...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 01, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: December 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 25, 2023SUMMONS
Date: October 25, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Supplemental Reply Affirmation |
||
January 09, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 09, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 04, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Courts email communication dated December 11, 2023 |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation in further support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of a Complain Reply Affirmation in further support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of a Complain ... show more |
||
January 04, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) October 30, 2023 - Email to Process Server with screenshot of Zip file |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail by Nixon Peabody |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) November 6, 2023 - Internal email with pictures of contents of mailing |
||
December 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - Affidavit of Service by Mail by Process Server |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.