Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Michelle Montesanto, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Merrick, Kristin, against Coriale Enterprises Inc., D B A Mcdonalds Of Penn Yan, represented by Carey, Adam Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Michelle Montesanto against Coriale Enterprises Inc., doing business as McDonald's of Penn Yan. The complaint alleges that on August 25, 2020, Michelle Montesanto slipped and fell on the wet, slippery tile ...
ANSWER
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 |
ANSWER Jascor - Answer to Amended Complaint |
||
December 13, 2023 |
ANSWER Coriale - Answer to Amended Complaint |
||
November 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Jascor Inc. |
||
November 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Coriale Enterprises Inc. |
||
October 30, 2023 |
SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons |
||
October 30, 2023 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Com |
||
October 11, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 21, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.