Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Stephen Hamelin, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by LVNV Funding LLC against Stephen Hamelin. The complaint alleges that the defendant entered into a revolving credit account agreement with Credit One Bank and incurred charges on the account, which they subs...
AFFIRMATION
Date: November 14, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 14, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 14, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 16, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
September 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 08, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 08, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.