Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bestmade Products, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case against Deborah L Von Wald, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: December 26, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: December 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | NOTICE TO ADMIT | ||
December 12, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to Court regarding proposed scheduling order |
||
December 06, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Scheduling order |
||
August 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service on Treasurer and Superintendent |
||
August 22, 2023 | Admission of Service by Assessor | ||
August 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 01, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Includes November 6, 2023 Tax Cert Calendar Call Notice |
||
July 31, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.