Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laura Cutlip, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Testa, Daniel Anthony, against Zachary Cutlip, represented by Forcier, Gerald Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
December 06, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
December 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 05, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
December 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
November 28, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
November 28, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
November 07, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 07, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
November 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.