Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Robin Updike, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Tony Potenza, represented by Guttman, W. Charles Julian, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 05, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: March 16, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT TEAMS link for May 8, 2023 Conference |
||
March 15, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
February 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Military Investigation |
||
February 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation Gregory L. Silverman, Esq. |
||
February 08, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for Default Judgement |
||
June 01, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 05, 2022 | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.