Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Joseph Bates Aka Joseph K Bates, in the jurisdiction of Seneca County, NY, . Seneca County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSeneca County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time85 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 19, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 13, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 13, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 12, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 12, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
March 12, 2020 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY | ||
March 12, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
March 12, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
March 12, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
March 12, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 28, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.