Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Torts case in the jurisdiction of Schuyler County. This case was filed in Schuyler County Superior Courts with HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Torts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSchuyler County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
POST-DISCONTINUED BAKER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
April 21, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) BAKER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
February 21, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) BAKER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
December 27, 2019 | Motion |
ORDER STRIKING ACTION FROM CAL (Motion #002) Decided: 04/21/2020MICHAEL BROWN FOR PLT, GERARD Before Justice: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
December 27, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) BAKER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
December 27, 2019 | Hearing |
POST-NOTE OF ISSUE RESTORATION BAKER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED BAKER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE BAKER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT BAKER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. CHRISTOPHER P. BAKER |
|
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MORRIS (Motion Part) Judge: HONORABLE DENNIS J. MORRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.