Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County. This case was filed in Schenectady County Superior Courts with HON. THOMAS D. BUCHANAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. THOMAS D. BUCHANAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2018 | Hearing |
POST-SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL BUCHANAN (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. THOMAS D. BUCHANAN |
|
January 24, 2018 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE CARUSO (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL SET FOR CARUSO (Trial Part) Held Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
January 04, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CARUSO (Pre-Trial Conference) Held Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
December 07, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CARUSO (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
August 31, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CARUSO (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
August 29, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CARUSO (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
|
August 01, 2017 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED BUCHANAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. THOMAS D. BUCHANAN |
|
April 21, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-COURTS OWN MOTION BUCHANAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. THOMAS D. BUCHANAN |
|
December 15, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE CARUSO (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: HON. VITO C. CARUSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.