Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cheli, Deana Rose, Falasco, Todd C, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Joshua Farry, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Sunmark Credit Union, represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas D Buchanan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure proceeding filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation against Joshua Farry, Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, and Sunmark Credit Union. The plaintiff alleges that Joshua Farry executed a note and mortgage in the p...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B certs exhibits redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A legal description Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 10, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 10, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 10, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING - VICTORIA FARRY AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUNMARK CREDIT UNION (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SUNMARK FEDERAL CREDIT UNION) |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - VICTORIA FARRY AS JOHN DOE #1 |
||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Tenant Mailing- ANY & ALL OCCUPANTS |
||
December 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - JOSHUA FARRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.