Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Albany Medical Center Hospital, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Angelique G Goodwin, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 03, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: February 24, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 24, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
January 03, 2023 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
November 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SCRA/Non-Military Affidavit |
||
November 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 08, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.