Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
George Smith, George Smith By His Attorney-In-Fact Andre Mainnain, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Lissauer, Lawrence D, Zaransky, Michael Bruce, against John And Or Jane Doe, Niskayuna Operating Co., Llc D B A Pathways Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, Pathways Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, And, represented by Semlies, Lori Rosen, Wolliaston, Kadeem O, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts with Mark L Powers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark L Powers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nursing Home) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 13, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 03, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 26, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 02, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: January 05, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 05, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | ||
November 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 01, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service of So Ordered Stipulation to Amend Caption |
||
August 04, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
||
August 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION | ||
August 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Amend Caption |
||
May 02, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.