Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Erika Pileggi, in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County, NY, . Schenectady County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022EXECUTION
Date: June 26, 2023ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: June 22, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | EXECUTION | ||
June 07, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 25, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.