Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Schenectady County. This case was filed in Schenectady County Superior Courts with Sharon B. Bowles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon B. Bowles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2013 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSchenectady County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
October 14, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
September 14, 2016 | Motion |
DELIVER POSSESSION (Motion #003) Decided: 10/14/2016GRANTED - ORDER SIGNED Before Justice: HON. RICHARD E. SISE Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
September 14, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
September 14, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
April 08, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
April 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT SISE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
March 04, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
|
February 02, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) SISE (Motion Part) Judge: HON. RICHARD E. SISE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.