Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shawn M Renner, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sutton, John William, against Kamolkan Renner, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Dianne N Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 28, 2022 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
October 28, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
October 27, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
October 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
October 13, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
October 13, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 13, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
October 13, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.