Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
James J Walker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Curtin, Caitlin Lorraine, Mastaitis, Katherine Lida, against Erica L Walker, represented by Brogoch, Carla Anne, Wilson, Kristopher Philip, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Paul Pelagalli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 19, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 12, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 30, 2022 | ORDER - CONSOLIDATION | ||
November 29, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 29, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 28, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.