Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tegan Brown, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Fiske, Michael Immanuel, against Howard Zucker Department Of Health, Theodore Kastner Office For People With Developmental Disabilities, represented by Kerwin, Adrienne Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Richard A Kupferman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard A Kupferman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 25, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) to Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Sept. 2, 2021 entered order |
||
September 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) re. Sept. 2, 2021 order |
||
September 02, 2021 | ORDER - DISMISSAL | ||
September 01, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Re.: proposed order |
||
September 01, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) *Corrected* Proposed order on notice amended |
||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 25, 2021 | MEMORANDUM | ||
August 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1-2 Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 25, 2021 |
ANSWER Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 25, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.