Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hunt, James T, Mount, Christopher Robert, Sussman, David Jeffrey, against Carlos Fuentes, represented by Greco, Louis Carl, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 16, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: May 04, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) dismissal |
||
June 25, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
May 04, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 19, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
February 16, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
February 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/CARLOS FUENTES |
||
January 19, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT CIT42433 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.