Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Kristal L Gessler, represented by Pentkowski, David H., in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 25, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#442834
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 25, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) STATEMENTS |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) INTERROGATORIES |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) CHARGE OFF STATEMENT |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE |
||
August 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) ANSWER |
||
August 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.