Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Michael Chow, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 27, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 14, 2020ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: July 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1) PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR DOCS
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) SELLER ACCOUNT ITEMIZATION
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) CHARGE OFF STATEMENT |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR DOCS PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR DOCS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) CHARGE OFF STATEMENT |
||
August 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 08, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.