Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hubert, Garry John, against Ly, Praset, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Philip A. Champlin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions282 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time282 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; State Farm General Insurance Co. vs. Ly, P. ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; State Farm General Insurance Co. vs. Ly, P. Motion OSC Details: 221730 - Failure to File Default ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 4 2007 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 224110-Memorandum Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff MEMORANDUM [224110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.