Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jointa Galusha, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by D'Andrea, Karen Elizabeth Shelton, against Terry Hagadorn, Tnt Excavating Holding Company, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with James E Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 25, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 23, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 27, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 27, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 23, 2021 | Affidavit of Default | ||
September 23, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Application for Default Judgment |
||
September 23, 2021 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
September 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Interest Calculation |
||
September 23, 2021 | Affidavit of Attorney Fees | ||
September 23, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.