Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management156 days |
Filing DateMay 19, 2015 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CHAUVIN (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
November 06, 2015 | Hearing |
POST-DISCONTINUED CHAUVIN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
October 22, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CHAUVIN (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
September 21, 2015 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED CHAUVIN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
June 19, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CHAUVIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
May 19, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CHAUVIN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
|
May 19, 2015 | Motion |
OSC (Motion #001) Decided: 06/19/2015 Before Justice: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. ROBERT J. CHAUVIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.