Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Leonard Putney, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by White, Michael Louis, against Seaway Tire And Auto Service, Inc., represented by Spencer, Sean Michael, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of St. Lawrence County, New York. The plaintiff, Leonard Putney, is suing the defendant, Seaway Tire and Auto Service, Inc. The complaint alleges that on April 8, 2021, the plaintiff fell and sustained se...
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 01, 2023JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF REFERRAL: ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) SCHEDULING ORDER WITH PCSO |
||
November 30, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 09, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE LETTER WITH PCSO & SAMPLE ADR ORDER WITH 4JD RULES |
||
November 08, 2023 | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | ||
November 07, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 01, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
November 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Social Media Information |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Specific Ad Damnum |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.