Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Tyrpak, Jeffrey J., against Heidi L. Summers, John Doe, Michael John Summers Jr., in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Ally Bank against Michael John Summers, Jr. and Heidi L. Summers. The complaint alleges that the defendants breached a retail installment contract for the purchase of a 2018 Chevrolet Tahoe. The contract re...
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: September 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: September 06, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 30, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) REPLEVIN ORDER |
||
October 27, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Michael John Summers, Jr. |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Heidi Summers |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Mailing Amended Order to Show Cause |
||
September 21, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED) (Motion #1) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
September 19, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) | ||
September 11, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
||
September 06, 2023 | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.