Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nbt Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burgess, Peter Landon, against City Of Ogdensburg, Jaylene M. Dawley As Administrator Of The Estate Of Amy Jo Perretta, The Estate Of Amy Jo Perretta, Timothy Dawley, represented by Goldie, Scott B., in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action brought by NBT Bank, National Association against the Estate of Amy Jo Perretta, Jaylene M. Dawley as Administrator of the Estate of Amy Jo Perretta, Timothy Dawley, City of Ogdensburg, and John/Jane Doe. The pr...
ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2024SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE Green Card - Service |
||
January 18, 2024 | Admission of Service and Notice of Appearance | ||
January 09, 2024 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint |
||
January 09, 2024 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Amended Notice of Pendency |
||
January 09, 2024 |
SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Amended Summons |
||
January 08, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ORDER |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Exhibit 4 - Successor Administrator Appointment Certificate |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Appointment |
||
December 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) MHP Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.