Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Owsiany, Grzegorz, against Chelsea R Smith, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Saint Lawrence. The plaintiff, Cavalry SPV I, LLC, is suing the defendant, Chelsea R Smith, in a consumer credit transaction case. The basis of the venu...
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 08, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT BUYER | ||
December 08, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
December 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
December 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
December 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
December 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MIL | ||
October 02, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
September 13, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
September 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- CHELSEA R SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.