Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Andrew Belair As Administrator Of The Estate Of Ashley Mcdonald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yatto, Thomas Carl, against Megan M Phelix, represented by Tomko, Sean Andrew, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: March 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 18, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: December 12, 2016COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: December 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 11, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
||
April 11, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
March 25, 2022 |
ORDER - FINAL ORDER |
||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 3/8/2022 LETTER, ANGELA M. STENROOS, ESQ. TO THOMAS C. YATTO, ESQ. |
||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 6.10.2019 ST. LAWRENCE COUNTY SURROGATE'S COURT CERT. OF APPT. OF ADMIN. |
||
March 24, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 3.2.2022 LETTER, SEAN A. TOMKO, ESQ. TO THOMAS C. YATTO, ESQ. |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B closing statement |
||
February 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.