Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Case, David P, against Gregory S. Blackmer, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, Larry Brown, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 30, 2016APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: November 30, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 18, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ORDER FOR WRIT OF ASSISTANCE |
||
October 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 03, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE |
||
September 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) TERMS AND REPORT OF SALE |
||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 06, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NOTICE TO QUIT |
||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON MILITARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.