Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Black River Heating Plumbing & Air Conditioning Inc, Brasher Falls Central School District, Sei Design Group Architects Dpc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sheats, Edward J, against Black River Heating Plumbing & Air Conditioning Inc, Brasher Falls Central School District, Me Enginerring Pc, Sei Design Group Architects Dpc, represented by Davoli, Stephen A, Lauricella, Peter Alan, Priore, Christopher A., in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER
Date: January 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
March 08, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
January 06, 2017 | ANSWER | ||
January 06, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 06, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
November 21, 2016 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT THIRD PARTY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
||
November 21, 2016 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
November 17, 2016 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT STIPULATION AND ORDER |
||
November 17, 2016 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
August 16, 2016 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.