Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Gay Grant, Tracy Adle Aka Grant, Tracy Adle Aka Grant, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2014 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 11, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 25, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM HON. MARY M. FARLEY, J.S.C. |
||
July 22, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM HON. MARY M. FARLEY, J.S.C. |
||
September 28, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM HON. MARY M. FARLEY, J.S.C. (CONFERENCE) |
||
June 25, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
June 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 25, 2021 |
CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Conversion |
||
August 07, 2014 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.