Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Michele Fobare, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2020ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 10, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2020STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: August 06, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
||
August 06, 2020 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
February 10, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 05, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 07, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 07, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.