Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
First Bank Security, Security First Bank Dba Proceed Finance, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leopold, Saul O, against Joseph Disotell, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2019ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2019JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Amending Complaint | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ORDER AMENDING COMPLAINT |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AOS |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Amended Notice of Motion |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) LETTER FROM JUDGE |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Exhibit 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.