Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Steven Kirby, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bogdan, Robert Peter, against Housing Authority Ogdensburg, Ogdensburg Housing Authority Board Directors, The Board Of Directors Of The Ogdensburg Housing Authority, The Ogdensburg Housing Authority, William J Jr Seymour, (total of 6) See All represented by Whitaker, Robert Charles, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D LETTERS |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C LETTERS |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B LETTERS |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A LETTERS |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C NOTICE OF CLAIM |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.