Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County. This case was filed in St. Lawrence County Superior Courts with HON MARY M FARLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON MARY M FARLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management971 days |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1027 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FARLEY (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
February 14, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FARLEY (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 20, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FARLEY (Court Activity) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 17, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) FARLEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 17, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FARLEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE OF ISSUE RESTORATION FARLEY (Court Activity) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 06, 2017 | Motion |
JOFS (Motion #002) Decided: 11/17/2017GRANTED Before Justice: HON MARY M FARLEY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 06, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) FARLEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
November 18, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-OTHER FARLEY (Court Activity) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE MULLER (Court Activity) Judge: HON ROBERT J MULLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.