Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Comprehensive Merchant Capital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nichols, Adam Richard, Piekarski, Mendy Menachem, against Gina E Ogwude, Haagi Co., Haagi Co-Dba, Wv Center For Peace And Conflict, Inc., Wv. Family Support And Rehabilitation, (total of 13) See All represented by Garibian, Antranig, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Christie D'Alessio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristie D'Alessio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Comprehensive Merchant Capital against WV. Family Support and Rehabilitation Services, Inc. and Gina Elaine Ogwude. The plaintiff alleges that they entered into two agreements with the defendants, referred to as the First A...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 26, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Discovery Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 28, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: January 11, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 16, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Proof of Funding Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Funding Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024ANSWER
Date: December 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 26, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 26, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) Defendants' Counter-Statement of Material Facts |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Garibian Affirmation - Ex B (Case law - Portillo - second MSJ denial) |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Garibian Affirmation - Ex A (Case law - Portillo) |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Garibian Affirmation - Ex C (BF v Holy City) |
||
January 26, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Transaction/Remittance History |
||
January 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Counsel |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR Pleadings Redacted |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Discovery Redacted per 22 NYCRR Discovery Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.