Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gardens At Palisades Condominium-Bd Mgrs, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Occhipinti, Anthony J, Occhipinti, Anthony John, against Marvin Morgan, Thelmina Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor J Alfieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Non-Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time230 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 09, 2015JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 25, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 18, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 18, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 25, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 18, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: June 25, 2015REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: October 03, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 25, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2015OATH
Date: June 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 27, 2015SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 31, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 27, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 27, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 25, 2015RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 27, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2015 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE'S REPORT AND OTHER RELIEF |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Judgment of Forclosure and Sale |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Order Confirming Referee Report |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order of Reference |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service on Referee |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Oath of Referee |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Deed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.