Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A & M Merchandising Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gulko, Ralph, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Stephen Dalsass, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time174 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2014SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2015SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2017 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 26, 2017 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 26, 2017 | ||
April 12, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 24, 2015 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
June 23, 2015 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 23, 2015 | ||
June 23, 2015 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 02, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 02, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 31, 2014 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 31, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.