Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Decocrete Llc, Selective Casualty Insurance Co-Aso, Selective Casualty Insurance Company A S O Decocrete, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bevis, Joseph Celawdon, Cavanaugh, Kathleen, Lewis, Paul Michael, against C&D Rodriguez Construction Inc, C&D Rodriguez Construction, Inc., Cirilo Rodriguez, Julio A Perez, Ma&B Transportation Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Lee, Peter Y., Newman, Samuel L, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Conversion And Replevin) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeCollections |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 04, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 04, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 15, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 31, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2022REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 20, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 20, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
November 12, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE REQUEST TO ATTEND VIRTUALLY |
||
November 02, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 19, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 18, 2022 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) REPLY TO CROSS CLAIMS OF DEF'T MEDCO |
||
October 09, 2022 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
September 02, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) OPPOSITON TO MOTION TO EXTEND |
||
August 15, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION DISCOVERY DEMAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.