Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Hsbc Bank Usa Na, Leonides Martinez, Wanda I Martinez, Wanda Martinez Aka, represented by Ugell, Scott B, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Mandatory Appearance Part (Map2(R)) presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 21, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: May 15, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 30, 2013STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2017REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 13, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 24, 2013LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2018ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #001)
Date: March 16, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: September 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 20, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Filed by AZF - 20153014 |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Filed by AZF - 20153014 |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Filed by AZF - WOG#20153014 |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Filed by AZF - WOG#20153014 |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE dmb 20153014 NMSC |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT dmb 20153014 AOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.