Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wolter, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Kairy, Byllee, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exparte Application 912430-Hearing: Exparte; Wolter, H. vs. Kairy, B. ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Wolter, H. vs. Kairy, B. Motion OSC Details: 911220 - Domestic Violence ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931210-OSC Hearing; Wolter, H. vs. Kairy, B. Motion OSC Details: 911220 - Domestic Violence ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order 913520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: STIPULATION AND ORDER [913520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Agreement 933210-Agreement Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court AGREEMENT [933210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By COURT [924110] |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937810-Co-Mediation Appointment; Wolter, H. vs. Kairy, B. ; Judge: FL0004 Scales Donovan Additional Info : Donovan and Maria Judge: Scales, Donovan |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937810-Co-Mediation Appointment; Wolter, H. vs. Kairy, B. ; Judge: FL0005 Mihm Maria Additional Info : Donovan and Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
|
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.