Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Adde, Tabeetha, Tarab, Margaret Burke, against Landscape Group, Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, Stacey Nunes, State Tax Commission, Steven Nunes, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2022SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: November 02, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
December 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service STEVEN NUNES |
||
December 20, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE |
||
December 20, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form |
||
December 08, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - NO DOES |
||
December 08, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
November 26, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth form |
||
November 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service THE LANDSCAPE GROUP |
||
November 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC |
||
November 02, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.