Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sheila Lopez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lapp, Ira Harley, Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Christopher J. Griffin, represented by Boera, Cathryn Carlson, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Christie D'Alessio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 14, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 30, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 31, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 30, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 29, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of AZ - Rockland |
||
December 29, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Req 4 PC, Affirm GF |
||
December 29, 2022 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
||
December 14, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
November 09, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 09, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - CHRISTOPHER J. GRIFFIN |
||
October 26, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.