Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company A S O Thomas Falcicchio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Amarasinghe, Jami C, against Heatilator Inc. D B A Hearth & Home Technologies, Inc., Mcnamara Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc., represented by Murski, Karina E, Walsh, Christopher Jude, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time447 days |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2012ANSWER
Date: April 23, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 21, 2013ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: September 24, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2011ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 01, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 24, 2012 |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #001) | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Pro Hac Vice |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI FALCICCHIO |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | answer to cross claim | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.