Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elizabeth Ford, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Akerib, David, Lissauer, Lawrence D, against Corsa Management Corporation, Mayfair Realty Apts, L.L.C., represented by Bernheimer, Jason M, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2012RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 20, 2012PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 20, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 17, 2012ANSWER
Date: February 15, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, 2012 |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Reuest for PC |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation for caption to reflect defendant's correct name |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer and Demands |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secured |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secured |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Secured |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Secured |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.