Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rockland Employees Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cember, William A, against Pierre E Desir, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
November 23, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
November 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - AMENDED |
||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
October 25, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint & Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.